Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Dismissal With Prejudice - Judgment filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case in the jurisdiction of Stearns County, MN, . Stearns County, MN Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2017 |
CategoryEviction (Ud) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationStearns County, MN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index # 9 | |
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judgment Index # 8 (Judicial Officer: Scherer, John H. )
Judge: Scherer, John H. |
|
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Court Clerk Minutes Index # 6 | |
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order for Dismissal Index # 7 (Judicial Officer: Scherer, John H. )
Judge: Scherer, John H. |
|
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Dismissal With Prejudice - Judgment (Judicial Officer: Scherer, John H.)
Judge: Scherer, John H. |
|
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Certify Personal Service Index # 4 | |
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service Index # 5 | |
December 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Certify Personal Service Index # 3 | |
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Eviction Summons Index # 2 | |
December 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Complaint-Civil Index # 1 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.