Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ps4H Ltd, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Soczynski, Adam - Lead Attorney, against Johnson, Judith, Raper, Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Stearns County, MN, . Stearns County, MN Superior Courts with Scherer, John presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2017 |
CategoryReduced Mortgage Redemption |
Last RefreshedOctober 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationStearns County, MN |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Complaint-Civil Index #3
Date: December 15, 2017Summons Index #4
Date: December 15, 2017Affidavit of Service by Posting Index #18
Date: January 16, 2018Correspondence Filed By: Attorney SOCZYNSKI, ADAM Index #8
Date: January 03, 2018Request for Telephone Appearance Index #1
Date: December 15, 2017Court Clerk Minutes Index #14
Date: January 05, 2018Proposed Order or Document Index #2
Date: December 15, 2017Proposed Order or Document Index #13
Date: January 03, 2018Order Reducing Redemption Period Judicial Officer: Scherer, John H. Index #15
Date: January 05, 2018Copy Request Filed By: Attorney SOCZYNSKI, ADAM Index #17
Date: January 05, 2018Certify Unserved Process Filed By: Defendant Raper, Anthony Index #7
Date: December 27, 2017Affidavit-Other Filed By: Attorney SOCZYNSKI, ADAM Index #12
Date: January 03, 2018Notice of Filing of Order Filed By: Attorney SOCZYNSKI, ADAM Index #16
Date: January 05, 2018Affidavit of Service by Posting Index #9
Date: January 03, 2018Affidavit of Mailing Filed By: Defendant Johnson, Judith; Defendant Raper, Anthony Index #11
Date: January 03, 2018Affidavit of Not Found Index #10
Date: January 03, 2018Certify Unserved Process Filed By: Defendant Johnson, Judith Index #5
Date: December 27, 2017Affidavit of Service by Posting Index #6
Date: December 27, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service by Posting Index #18 | |
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service by Posting Index # 18 | |
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Court Clerk Minutes Index #14 | |
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Reducing Redemption Period Judicial Officer: Scherer, John H. Index #15 | |
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Copy Request Filed By: Attorney SOCZYNSKI, ADAM Index #17 | |
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Filed By: Attorney SOCZYNSKI, ADAM Index #16 | |
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Copy Request Index # 17 | |
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index # 16 | |
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Court Clerk Minutes Index # 14 | |
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Reducing Redemption Period Index # 15 (Judicial Officer: Scherer, John H. )
Judge: Scherer, John H. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.