Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Eviction Hearing filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case in the jurisdiction of Stearns County, MN, . Stearns County, MN Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 24, 2012 |
CategoryEviction (Ud) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationStearns County, MN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Certify Personal Service | |
January 14, 2013 | Docket Event | Writ of Recovery of Premises | |
January 14, 2013 | Docket Event | Returned Mail | |
January 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment (Judicial Officer: Mahler, Mary B. )
Judge: Mahler, Mary B. |
|
January 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order and Judgment-Eviction (Judicial Officer: Mahler, Mary B. )
Judge: Mahler, Mary B. |
|
January 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judgment (Judicial Officer: Mahler, Mary B. )
Judge: Mahler, Mary B. |
|
January 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Eviction, Violation of Covenants - Judgment (Judicial Officer: Mahler, Mary B.)
Judge: Mahler, Mary B. |
|
January 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Affidavit-Other | |
January 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing | |
December 31, 2012 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service by Posting |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.