Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Dismissal With Prejudice - Judgment filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Stearns County, MN, . Stearns County, MN Superior Courts with Landwehr, Vicki E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2010 |
CategoryContract |
Last RefreshedOctober 26, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationStearns County, MN |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Judgment
Judge: Landwehr, Vicki E. |
|
June 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment
Judge: Landwehr, Vicki E. |
|
June 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order for Dismissal (Judicial Officer: Landwehr, Vicki E. )
Judge: Landwehr, Vicki E. |
|
June 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
Dismissal With Prejudice - Judgment (Judicial Officer: Landwehr, Vicki E.)
Judge: Landwehr, Vicki E. |
|
June 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dismissal with Prejudice
Judge: Landwehr, Vicki E. |
|
May 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
Schedule Hearing (Judicial Officer: Landwehr, Vicki E. )
Judge: Landwehr, Vicki E. |
|
January 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Representation
Judge: Landwehr, Vicki E. |
|
January 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service
Judge: Landwehr, Vicki E. |
|
January 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Certify Personal Service
Judge: Landwehr, Vicki E. |
|
January 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Summons and Complaint
Judge: Landwehr, Vicki E. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.