Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Conciliation case represented by Arnal, Corbin Cribbs - Lead Attorney, against Dutoit, Andre, in the jurisdiction of Stearns County, MN, . Stearns County, MN Superior Courts with Moehrle, Laura presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2022 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationStearns County, MN |
|
Judgment Index #8
Date: February 13, 2023Summons Index #4
Date: December 09, 2022Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Moehrle, Laura Index #6
Date: January 11, 2023Certificate of Representation Index #2
Date: December 06, 2022Statement of Claim Filed By: Attorney ARNAL, CORBIN CRIBBS Index #1
Date: December 06, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Transcript of Judgment Issued Index #9 | |
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment Index #8 | |
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Filed By: Attorney ARNAL, CORBIN CRIBBS; Defendant Dutoit, Andre Index #7 | |
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Moehrle, Laura Index #6 | |
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons Index #4 | |
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Filed By: Attorney ARNAL, CORBIN CRIBBS; Defendant Dutoit, Andre Index #3 | |
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Conciliation Court Served by First Class Mail by Ct Adm Filed By: Defendant Dutoit, Andre Index #5 | |
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 3 | |
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Conciliation Court Served by First Class Mail by Ct Adm Index # 5 | |
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons Index # 4 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.