Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Conciliation Hearing filed a(n) Conciliation case in the jurisdiction of Stearns County, MN, . Stearns County, MN Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2012 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationStearns County, MN |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order | |
June 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Order Vacating Judgment | |
May 23, 2013 | Docket Event | Correspondence | |
February 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order for Judgment (Judicial Officer: Carrott, Ann L. )
Judge: Carrott, Ann L. |
|
February 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order (Judicial Officer: Carrott, Ann L. )
Judge: Carrott, Ann L. |
|
February 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judgment (Judicial Officer: Carrott, Ann L. )
Judge: Carrott, Ann L. |
|
February 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Dismissal without prejudice (Judicial Officer: Carrott, Ann L.)
Judge: Carrott, Ann L. |
|
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service | |
January 03, 2013 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service | |
December 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Statement of Claim and Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.