Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
In the Matter of the Civil Commitment of Arvesta T Kelly, Respondent
On October 06, 2020 a commitment - mentally ill & chemically dependent case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Ramsey County, MN. Judge Warner, Teresa presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 06, 2020
Last Refreshed
October 28, 2023
Filing Location
Ramsey County, MN
Category
Commitment - Mentally Ill & Chemically Dependent
Case Outcome Type
Continued Commitment - Chemically Dependent
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Correspondence Index #53 | |
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Correspondence | |
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Order for Continued Commitment Judicial Officer: Bartsh, Shawn M. Index #52 | |
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order for Continued Commitment
Judge: Bartsh, Shawn M. |
|
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Using Remote Technology Filed By: Attorney CAREY, TIMOTHY PATRICK; Respondent Kelly, Arvesta T; Name Not Available Online; Attorney RAUENHORST, KATHLEEN K | |
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Order for Continued Commitment Judicial Officer: Bartsh, Shawn M. Index #51 | |
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order for Continued Commitment
Judge: Bartsh, Shawn M. |
|
April 08, 2021 | hearing | Hearing Held Using Remote Technology | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Examiner's Report Index #49 | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Examiner's Report Index #50 | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Examiner's Report | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Order for Production of Medical Records Judicial Officer: Mulrooney, Timothy Index #48 | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index #47 | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order for Production of Medical Records
Judge: Mulrooney, Timothy |
|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Returned Mail Index #46 | |
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Returned Mail | |
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Scheduling Order Judicial Officer: Mulrooney, Timothy Index #44 | |
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Examiner Index #45 | |
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Scheduling Order
Judge: Mulrooney, Timothy |
|
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Examiner | |
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Report-Other Index #42 | |
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event | 6-Month Report Index #41 | |
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Correspondence Index #43 | |
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event | 6-Month Report | |
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Correspondence | |
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Report-Other | |
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event | 60-90 Day Commitment Report Index #39 | |
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Report-Other Index #40 | |
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event | 60-90 Day Commitment Report | |
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Report-Other | |
November 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Provisional Discharge Index #38 | |
November 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Provisional Discharge | |
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Copy Request Index #37 | |
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Copy Request | |
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Order for Commitment and Treatment with NTP Index #36 | |
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Order for Commitment and Treatment with NTP | |
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Using Remote Technology Filed By: Respondent Kelly, Arvesta T; Attorney RAUENHORST, KATHLEEN K | |
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Correspondence Index #34 | |
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Examiner's Report Index #33 | |
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Order-Other Judicial Officer: Warner, Teresa R. Index #35 | |
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Examiner's Report | |
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order-Other
Judge: Warner, Teresa R. |
|
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Correspondence | |
October 15, 2020 | hearing | Hearing Held Using Remote Technology | |
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service Index #32 | |
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service | |
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Examiner's Report Index #31 | |
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Examiner's Report Index #28 | |
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Examiner's Report Index #29 | |
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Examiner's Report Index #30 | |
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Examiner's Report | |
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Order for Production of Medical Records Judicial Officer: Warner, Teresa R. Index #26 | |
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Order for Production of Medical Records Judicial Officer: Warner, Teresa R. Index #27 | |
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order for Production of Medical Records
Judge: Warner, Teresa R. |
|
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Correspondence Index #21 | |
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Second Examiner Selected by Respondent Index #23 | |
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Using Remote Technology Filed By: Respondent Kelly, Arvesta T; Attorney RAUENHORST, KATHLEEN K; Name Not Available Online | |
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Examiner Index #22 | |
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index #24 | |
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index #25 | |
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Preliminary Hearing Order Judicial Officer: Warner, Teresa R. Index #20 | |
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Correspondence | |
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document | |
October 08, 2020 | hearing |
Preliminary Hearing Order
Judge: Warner, Teresa R. |
|
October 08, 2020 | hearing | Hearing Held Using Remote Technology | |
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Second Examiner Selected by Respondent | |
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Examiner | |
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Index #19 | |
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Attorney Index #18 | |
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Attorney | |
October 07, 2020 | hearing | Notice of Hearing | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Report-Other Index #2 | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Petition for Judicial Commitment Index #1 | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Pre-Petition Screening Report Index #4 | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Examiner's Report in Support of Petition for Commitment Index #3 | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Report-Other Index #5 | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index #10 | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index #9 | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Report-Other Index #8 | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Order for Production of Medical Records Judicial Officer: Gilligan, Thomas, Jr. Index #15 | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Order for Production of Medical Records Judicial Officer: Gilligan, Thomas, Jr. Index #16 | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Correspondence Index #17 | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index #11 | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Order for Production of Medical Records Judicial Officer: Gilligan, Thomas, Jr. Index #14 | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Petition for Auth to Impose Treatment Neuroleptic Meds Index #6 | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Findings and Order Judicial Officer: Gilligan, Thomas, Jr. Index #13 | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit in Support of Imposed Treatment by ECT or NTP Index #7 | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index #12 | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Petition for Judicial Commitment | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Pre-Petition Screening Report | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Petition for Auth to Impose Treatment Neuroleptic Meds | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Report-Other | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Examiner's Report in Support of Petition for Commitment | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit in Support of Imposed Treatment by ECT or NTP | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order for Production of Medical Records
Judge: Gilligan, Thomas, Jr. |
|
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Findings and Order
Judge: Gilligan, Thomas, Jr. |
|
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Correspondence |