Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Regions Hospital, filed a(n) Commitment - Mentally Ill & Chemically Dependent case against Tyson, Vernell, in the jurisdiction of Ramsey County, MN, . Ramsey County, MN Superior Courts with William H. Leary presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 29, 2018 |
CategoryCommitment - Mentally Ill & Chemically Dependent |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationRamsey County, MN |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order for Dismissal Index # 38 (Judicial Officer: Leary, William H., III )
Judge: Leary, William H., III |
|
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Dismissed | |
October 10, 2018 | Docket Event | 60-90 Day Commitment Report Index # 37 | |
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Commitment Receipt Index # 36 | |
July 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order of Stayed Commitment Index # 35 (Judicial Officer: Castro, Leonardo )
Judge: Castro, Leonardo |
|
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Correspondence Index # 34 | |
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Other Document Index # 33 | |
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Waiver Index # 32 | |
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Waiver Index # 31 | |
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order-Other Index # 30 (Judicial Officer: Castro, Leonardo )
Judge: Castro, Leonardo |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.