Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Eviction Hearing filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case in the jurisdiction of Ramsey County, MN, . Ramsey County, MN Superior Courts with Bergstrom, Kathryn presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2022 |
CategoryEviction (Ud) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRamsey County, MN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Writ of Recovery of Premises Returned Index # 11
Judge: Bergstrom, Kathryn |
|
July 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Writ of Recovery of Premises Index # 10
Judge: Bergstrom, Kathryn |
|
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Writ of Recovery Index # 9
Judge: Bergstrom, Kathryn |
|
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Eviction, Non-Payment of Rent - Judgment (Judicial Officer: Bergstrom, Kathryn)
Judge: Bergstrom, Kathryn |
|
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order and Judgment-Eviction Index # 8 (Judicial Officer: Bergstrom, Kathryn )
Judge: Bergstrom, Kathryn |
|
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing Held Remote
Judge: Bergstrom, Kathryn |
|
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service by Posting Index # 7
Judge: Bergstrom, Kathryn |
|
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Index # 6
Judge: Bergstrom, Kathryn |
|
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Plaintiff Index # 3
Judge: Bergstrom, Kathryn |
|
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Not Found Index # 4
Judge: Bergstrom, Kathryn |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.