Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case in the jurisdiction of Ramsey County, MN, . Ramsey County, MN Superior Courts with Bergstrom, Kathryn presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 23, 2022 |
CategoryEviction (Ud) |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRamsey County, MN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeSettled |
Notice of Deficiency
Date: August 22, 2022Writ of Recovery of Premises Returned
Date: August 01, 2022Affidavit of Service
Date: August 15, 2022Writ of Recovery of Premises
Date: July 07, 2022Request or Motion for Expungement
Date: August 15, 2022Order Granting In Forma Pauperis
Date: September 09, 2022Affidavit of Non-Compliance
Date: July 06, 2022Affidavit of Service
Date: June 17, 2022Eviction Summons
Date: June 14, 2022Complaint-Civil
Date: May 23, 2022Order-Other
Date: June 28, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Granting In Forma Pauperis | |
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit for Proceeding In Forma Pauperis | |
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Deficiency | |
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service | |
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Request or Motion for Expungement | |
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit for Proceeding In Forma Pauperis | |
August 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Writ of Recovery of Premises Returned | |
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Writ of Recovery of Premises | |
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Non-Compliance | |
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order-Other
Judge: Bergstrom, Kathryn |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.