Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case in the jurisdiction of Ramsey County, MN, . Ramsey County, MN Superior Courts with Bergstrom, Kathryn presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 23, 2022 |
CategoryEviction (Ud) |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRamsey County, MN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeEviction, Non-Payment Of Rent - Judgment |
Order and Judgment-Eviction
Date: June 28, 2022Affidavit of Service by Posting
Date: June 22, 2022Affidavit of Mailing
Date: June 17, 2022Affidavit of Not Found
Date: June 17, 2022Affidavit of Plaintiff
Date: June 17, 2022Eviction Summons
Date: June 14, 2022Complaint-Civil
Date: May 23, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order and Judgment-Eviction
Judge: Bergstrom, Kathryn |
|
June 28, 2022 | Hearing | Hearing Held Remote | |
June 28, 2022 | Hearing | Fail to Appear at a hearing | |
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service by Posting | |
June 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing | |
June 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Not Found | |
June 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Plaintiff | |
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Eviction Summons | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint-Civil |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.