Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Ccf2, Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Perron, Donald Andrew - Lead Attorney, against Hodges, Kendra, in the jurisdiction of Ramsey County, MN, . Ramsey County, MN Superior Courts with Diamond, Patrick presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 23, 2022 |
CategoryEviction (Ud) |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRamsey County, MN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeSettled |
Writ of Recovery of Premises
Date: July 25, 2022Order-Other
Date: July 01, 2022Affidavit of Non-Compliance
Date: July 20, 2022Affidavit of Not Found
Date: June 27, 2022Affidavit of Plaintiff
Date: June 27, 2022Affidavit of Service by Posting
Date: June 27, 2022Affidavit of Mailing
Date: June 27, 2022Eviction Summons
Date: June 16, 2022Complaint-Civil
Date: May 23, 2022Eviction Summons Index #2
Date: June 16, 2022Writ of Recovery of Premises Returned Index #10
Date: October 13, 2022Writ of Recovery of Premises Judicial Officer: Diamond, Patrick C. Index #9
Date: July 25, 2022Affidavit of Mailing Index #3
Date: June 27, 2022Order-Other Judicial Officer: Bergstrom, Kathryn Index #7
Date: July 01, 2022Affidavit of Non-Compliance Index #8
Date: July 20, 2022Complaint-Civil Index #1
Date: May 23, 2022Affidavit of Plaintiff Index #5
Date: June 27, 2022Affidavit of Service by Posting Index #6
Date: June 27, 2022Affidavit of Not Found Index #4
Date: June 27, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Writ of Recovery of Premises Returned Index #10 | |
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Writ of Recovery of Premises
Judge: Diamond, Patrick C. |
|
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Writ of Recovery of Premises Judicial Officer: Diamond, Patrick C. Index #9 | |
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Non-Compliance | |
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Non-Compliance Index #8 | |
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order-Other
Judge: Bergstrom, Kathryn |
|
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Order-Other Judicial Officer: Bergstrom, Kathryn Index #7 | |
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Not Found | |
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Plaintiff |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.