Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Court Trial filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case in the jurisdiction of Ramsey County, MN, . Ramsey County, MN Superior Courts with Gail Chang Bohr presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 08, 2016 |
CategoryEviction (Ud) |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRamsey County, MN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Writ of Recovery of Premises Returned Index # 11 | |
October 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Returned Mail Index # 12 | |
October 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment Index # 10 | |
October 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment Index # 9 | |
October 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judgment (Judicial Officer: Bohr, Gail Chang) Party( Evans, Gwynne; Ashley, Mathew Oliver ) 1) A writ of recovery shall issue immediately. 2) The dfd shall pay rent in the amount of $1970.00 by the end of business August 31,2016.
Judge: Bohr, Gail Chang |
|
September 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Writ of Recovery of Premises Index # 8 | |
September 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Findings of Fact Conclusions of Law and Order Index # 7 (Judicial Officer: Bohr, Gail Chang )
Judge: Bohr, Gail Chang |
|
August 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
Taken Under Advisement Index # 5 (Judicial Officer: Bohr, Gail Chang )
Judge: Bohr, Gail Chang |
|
August 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List Index # 6 (Judicial Officer: Bohr, Gail Chang )
Judge: Bohr, Gail Chang |
|
August 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order for Trial Index # 4 (Judicial Officer: Awsumb, Robert )
Judge: Awsumb, Robert |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.