Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Faulhaber, Kelly Ann, Ramsey County Child Support, filed a(n) Support case against Anderson, Jeffrey Michael, in the jurisdiction of Ramsey County, MN, . Ramsey County, MN Superior Courts with Anderson, Ronelle presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2022 |
CategorySupport |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationRamsey County, MN |
|
Case Outcome TypeSupport Order |
Notice of Hearing
Date: May 31, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: July 27, 2022Order for Child Support
Date: July 27, 2022Notice of Filing of Order
Date: July 28, 2022Order for Child Support Judicial Officer: Anderson, Ronelle Index #13
Date: July 27, 2022Notice of Hearing Index #10
Date: May 31, 2022Order for Child Support Judicial Officer: Anderson, Ronelle Index #19
Date: October 20, 2022Notice of Hearing Index #12
Date: July 27, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Filed By: Respondent Anderson, Jeffrey Michael; Petitioner Faulhaber, Kelly Ann; Petitioner Ramsey County Child Support Index #20 | |
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Order for Child Support Judicial Officer: Anderson, Ronelle Index #19 | |
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Taken Under Advisement Judicial Officer: Anderson, Ronelle Index #18 | |
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index # 20 | |
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Taken Under Advisement Index # 18 (Judicial Officer: Anderson, Ronelle )
Judge: Anderson, Ronelle |
|
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order for Child Support Index # 19 (Judicial Officer: Anderson, Ronelle )
Judge: Anderson, Ronelle |
|
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Support order (Judicial Officer: Anderson, Ronelle)
Judge: Anderson, Ronelle |
|
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing Index #17 | |
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Financial Disclosure Form Index #15 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.