Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hearing filed a(n) Support case in the jurisdiction of Ramsey County, MN, . Ramsey County, MN Superior Courts with Edward S. Wilson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 09, 2017 |
CategorySupport |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationRamsey County, MN |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index # 25 | |
May 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order for Child Support Index # 24 (Judicial Officer: Wilson,Edward , )
Judge: Wilson,Edward , |
|
May 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Taken Under Advisement Index # 19 (Judicial Officer: Wilson,Edward , )
Judge: Wilson,Edward , |
|
April 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service Index # 21 | |
April 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Response to Motion for Review Index # 22 | |
April 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice-Other Index # 20 | |
April 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order for Submissions-Under Advisement Index # 18 (Judicial Officer: Wilson,Edward , )
Judge: Wilson,Edward , |
|
April 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Motion for Review-Magistrate Order Index # 17 | |
April 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Expedited Process | |
March 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Transcript Index # 16 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.