Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Certificate Of Dissolution Index # 30 filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Ramsey County, MN, . Ramsey County, MN Superior Courts with Wilson, Edward presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 12, 2016 |
CategoryDissolution With Child |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRamsey County, MN |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Copy Request Index # 32
Judge: Snow-Kaster, Christy |
|
November 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Summary Real Estate Disposition Judgment Index # 31 (Judicial Officer: Snow-Kaster, Christy )
Judge: Snow-Kaster, Christy |
|
November 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Dissolution Index # 30 (Judicial Officer: Wilson,Edward , )
Judge: Snow-Kaster, Christy |
|
November 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Closed at filing (Judicial Officer: Snow-Kaster, Christy)
Judge: Snow-Kaster, Christy |
|
November 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Copy Request Index # 29
Judge: Snow-Kaster, Christy |
|
November 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order or Document Index # 28
Judge: Snow-Kaster, Christy |
|
November 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment by Attorney or Party Index # 26
Judge: Snow-Kaster, Christy |
|
November 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Copy Request Index # 27
Judge: Snow-Kaster, Christy |
|
November 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Index # 25
Judge: Snow-Kaster, Christy |
|
November 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judgment Index # 24
Judge: Snow-Kaster, Christy |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.