Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Carroll, Donta Demon, filed a(n) Custody,Visitation - Family case against Linebaugh, Kia, in the jurisdiction of Ramsey County, MN, . Ramsey County, MN Superior Courts with Wilson, Edward presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 03, 2015 |
CategoryCustody |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRamsey County, MN |
Matter TypeCustody,Visitation |
Notice of Case Assignment Index #11
Date: April 06, 2015Notice of Case Assignment Index #10
Date: April 03, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2025 | Docket Event | Case Consolidated Index #30 | |
June 08, 2025 | Docket Event |
Case Consolidated Index # 30
Judge: Wilson,Edward , |
|
July 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Returned Mail Filed By: Respondent Linebaugh, Kia Index #36 | |
July 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Index # 36
Judge: Wilson,Edward , |
|
June 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service Index #34 | |
June 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order by Attorney or Party Filed By: Petitioner Carroll, Donta Demon Index #33 | |
June 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Correspondence Filed By: Petitioner Carroll, Donta Demon Index #35 | |
June 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Index # 35
Judge: Wilson,Edward , |
|
June 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Index # 34
Judge: Wilson,Edward , |
|
June 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order by Attorney or Party Index # 33
Judge: Wilson,Edward , |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.