Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ryan, Jill Elizabeth, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case against Peterson, Rheta Clair, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, MN, . Polk County, MN Superior Courts with Rasmusson, Anne presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2022 |
CategoryGuardianship/Conservatorship |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationPolk County, MN |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Notice to File or Appear - Guardian-Conservator Index #40
Date: April 10, 2023Affidavit of Service Index #30
Date: February 17, 2022Notice of Entry of Order Right to Appeal-Ward or Prot Person Index #31
Date: February 17, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #41
Date: April 10, 2023Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #34
Date: April 04, 2022Affidavit of Service Index #12
Date: January 18, 2022Notice of Filing of Order Index #5
Date: January 10, 2022Acceptance of Appointment and Oath Index #21
Date: February 09, 2022Petition for Guardianship - Conservatorship Filed By: Attorney Handy, Gretchen Index #1
Date: January 07, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #6
Date: January 11, 2022Notice of Filing of Order Index #14
Date: January 19, 2022Acceptance of Appointment and Oath Index #20
Date: February 09, 2022Order Granting Guardianship - Conservatorship Judicial Officer: Rasmusson, Anne Marie Index #24
Date: February 11, 2022Affidavit of Service Index #16
Date: January 26, 2022Affidavit of Mailing Index #15
Date: January 21, 2022Waiver of Counsel Index #11
Date: January 18, 2022Notice to New Conservators Index #29
Date: February 15, 2022Notice-Other Index #28
Date: February 15, 2022Notice of Filing of Order Index #9
Date: January 11, 2022Notice of Filing of Order Index #25
Date: February 15, 2022Proposed Order or Document Index #22
Date: February 09, 2022Proposed Order or Document Index #23
Date: February 09, 2022Order Granting In Forma Pauperis Judicial Officer: Harbott, Corey Index #4
Date: January 10, 2022Notice of Hearing Index #7
Date: January 11, 2022Proposed Order or Document Index #3
Date: January 07, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Inventory or Account Review Report Filed By: Conservator RYAN, JILL ELIZABETH; Guardian RYAN, JILL ELIZABETH; Petitioner RYAN, JILL ELIZABETH Index #45 | |
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Amended Annual Account Filed By: Conservator RYAN, JILL ELIZABETH; Guardian RYAN, JILL ELIZABETH; Petitioner RYAN, JILL ELIZABETH Index #44 | |
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event | CAAP Audit Report Filed By: Conservator RYAN, JILL ELIZABETH; Guardian RYAN, JILL ELIZABETH; Petitioner RYAN, JILL ELIZABETH Index #43 | |
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Personal Well-Being Report and Annual Notice of Rights Filed By: Conservator RYAN, JILL ELIZABETH; Guardian RYAN, JILL ELIZABETH; Petitioner RYAN, JILL ELIZABETH Index #42 | |
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice to File or Appear - Guardian-Conservator Index #40 | |
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #41 | |
April 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Annual or Periodic Accounting Filed By: Conservator RYAN, JILL ELIZABETH; Guardian RYAN, JILL ELIZABETH; Petitioner RYAN, JILL ELIZABETH Index #39 | |
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Inventory or Account Review Report Filed By: Conservator RYAN, JILL ELIZABETH; Guardian RYAN, JILL ELIZABETH; Petitioner RYAN, JILL ELIZABETH Index #38 | |
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Inventory or Account Review Report Index # 38 | |
August 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Amended Inventory Filed By: Conservator RYAN, JILL ELIZABETH; Guardian RYAN, JILL ELIZABETH; Petitioner RYAN, JILL ELIZABETH Index #37 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.