Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Johnson, James, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Polk County, MN, . Polk County, MN Superior Courts with Remick, Jeffrey presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 18, 2022 |
CategoryGuardianship/Conservatorship |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationPolk County, MN |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Proposed Order or Document Index #3
Date: February 18, 2022Proposed Order or Document Index #2
Date: February 18, 2022Petition for Emergency Guardianship - Conservatorship Index #1
Date: February 18, 2022Notice of Filing of Order Index #19
Date: February 25, 2022Affidavit of Service Index #15
Date: February 22, 2022Copy Request Filed By: Attorney SWANSON, HOWARD D Index #21
Date: March 21, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #11
Date: February 18, 2022Notice to New Conservators Index #20
Date: February 25, 2022Waiver of Counsel Index #16
Date: February 22, 2022Notice of Filing of Order Index #9
Date: February 18, 2022Order Granting Emergency Guardianship Judicial Officer: Remick, Jeffrey Scott Index #7
Date: February 18, 2022Proposed Order or Document Index #5
Date: February 18, 2022Acceptance of Appointment and Oath Index #4
Date: February 18, 2022Order-Other Judicial Officer: Harbott, Corey Index #18
Date: February 25, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Death Index #22 | |
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Death Index # 22 | |
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Termination of jurisdiction | |
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Copy Request Filed By: Attorney SWANSON, HOWARD D Index #21 | |
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Copy Request Index # 21 | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index #19 | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice to New Conservators Index #20 | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Order-Other Judicial Officer: Harbott, Corey Index #18 | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice to New Conservators Index # 20 | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index # 19 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.