Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Pietruszewski, Chad, filed a(n) Formal Unsupervised case in the jurisdiction of Polk County, MN, . Polk County, MN Superior Courts with Harbott, Corey presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 10, 2022 |
CategoryFormal Unsupervised |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPolk County, MN |
|
Affidavit of Service of Notice to the Comm of Human Services Index #15
Date: March 11, 2022Affidavit of Publication Index #14
Date: March 11, 2022Petition for Frml Adjudication of Intestacy-Determ of Heirs Index #2
Date: February 10, 2022Affidavit of Mailing Index #13
Date: February 14, 2022Notice to Creditors Index #11
Date: February 11, 2022Acceptance of Appointment and Oath Index #5
Date: February 10, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #10
Date: February 11, 2022Copy Request Index #20
Date: March 15, 2022Medical Assistance Clearance Index #21
Date: March 15, 2022Certificate of Representation Index #12
Date: February 14, 2022Notice of Filing of Order Index #19
Date: March 15, 2022Nomination of Personal Representative Index #4
Date: February 10, 2022Proposed Order or Document Index #9
Date: February 10, 2022Nomination of Personal Representative Index #3
Date: February 10, 2022Proposed Order or Document Index #8
Date: February 10, 2022Proposed Order or Document Index #7
Date: February 10, 2022Verification Under Oath Index #6
Date: February 10, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Claims Due | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Order for Frml Adjudication of Intestacy, Determin of Heir Judicial Officer: Harbott, Corey Index #17 | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Copy Request Index #20 | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Letters of General Administration Filed By: Personal Representative Pietruszewski, Chad; Petitioner Pietruszewski, Chad Index #18 | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Medical Assistance Clearance Index #21 | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index #19 | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Medical Assistance Clearance Index # 21 | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Copy Request Index # 20 | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index # 19 | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Letters of General Administration Index # 18 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.