Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Commitment Hearing filed a(n) Commitment - Mentally Ill & Chemically Dependent case in the jurisdiction of Polk County, MN, . Polk County, MN Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2021 |
CategoryCommitment - Mentally Ill & Chemically Dependent |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationPolk County, MN |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index # 22 | |
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Terminating Proceeding and Discharging Patient Index # 21 (Judicial Officer: Harbott, Corey )
Judge: Harbott, Corey |
|
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Termination of jurisdiction (Judicial Officer: Harbott, Corey)
Judge: Harbott, Corey |
|
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event | 6-Month Report Index # 20 | |
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event | 60-90 Day Commitment Report Index # 19 | |
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index # 17 | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Stayed Commitment Index # 16 (Judicial Officer: Remick, Jeffrey Scott )
Judge: Remick, Jeffrey Scott |
|
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index # 15 | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Taken Under Advisement Index # 14 (Judicial Officer: Davies, Heidi )
Judge: Davies, Heidi |
|
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Using Remote Technology |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.