Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Monda, Kathy Ann, filed a(n) Formal Unsupervised case in the jurisdiction of Polk County, MN, . Polk County, MN Superior Courts with Remick, Jeffrey presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryFormal Unsupervised |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPolk County, MN |
|
Petition to Allow Final Acctg., Settle and Distribute Estate Index #24
Date: July 11, 2023Proposed Order or Document Index #25
Date: July 11, 2023Affidavit of Mailing Index #29
Date: July 11, 2023Inventory Index #22
Date: July 11, 2023Medical Assistance Clearance Filed By: Attorney RUST, DANIEL L Index #20
Date: November 09, 2021Copy Request Index #21
Date: September 21, 2022Final Accounting Index #23
Date: July 11, 2023Consent to Final Acct-Issuance of Decree-Order of Distrib Index #28
Date: July 11, 2023Consent to Final Acct-Issuance of Decree-Order of Distrib Index #27
Date: July 11, 2023Notice of Filing of Order Index #18
Date: October 13, 2021Proposed Order or Document Index #5
Date: September 07, 2021Verification Under Oath Index #3
Date: September 07, 2021Acceptance of Appointment and Oath Index #2
Date: September 07, 2021Affidavit of Publication Index #15
Date: October 07, 2021Order Formal Probate of Will Judicial Officer: Remick, Jeffrey Scott Index #17
Date: October 12, 2021Affidavit of Mailing Filed By: Attorney RUST, DANIEL L Index #14
Date: October 07, 2021Will - Electronic Version Index #7
Date: September 07, 2021Notice to Spouse and Children Index #11
Date: September 13, 2021Petition for Discharge of Personal Representative Filed By: Attorney RUST, DANIEL L Index #32
Date: September 13, 2023Proposed Order or Document Index #33
Date: September 13, 2023Notice of Filing of Order Index #31
Date: July 13, 2023Consent to Final Acct-Issuance of Decree-Order of Distrib Index #26
Date: July 11, 2023Order Discharging Personal Representative Judicial Officer: Harbott, Corey Index #34
Date: September 13, 2023Affidavit of Mailing Index #10
Date: September 13, 2021Proposed Order or Document Index #6
Date: September 07, 2021Notice of Filing of Order Index #35
Date: September 13, 2023Notice to Creditors Index #9
Date: September 08, 2021Proposed Order or Document Index #4
Date: September 07, 2021Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #8
Date: September 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition for Discharge of Personal Representative Filed By: Attorney RUST, DANIEL L Index #32 | |
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index #33 | |
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Discharging Personal Representative Judicial Officer: Harbott, Corey Index #34 | |
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index #35 | |
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index #31 | |
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Allow Final Acct , Settling Estate, Order of Distrib Judicial Officer: Remick, Jeffrey Scott Index #30 | |
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition to Allow Final Acctg., Settle and Distribute Estate Index #24 | |
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index #25 | |
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing Index #29 | |
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Inventory Index #22 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.