Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Johnson, Kent, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case against Johnson, Gordon L., in the jurisdiction of Polk County, MN, . Polk County, MN Superior Courts with Yon, Tamara presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 07, 2017 |
CategoryGuardianship/Conservatorship |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationPolk County, MN |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Notice of Filing of Order Index #9
Date: December 15, 2017Order Appointing Attorney Filed By: Attorney FISCHER, TRENT JAMES Index #8
Date: December 15, 2017Affidavit of Service Index #7
Date: December 14, 2017Petition for Guardianship Index #1
Date: December 07, 2017Proposed Order or Document Index #2
Date: December 07, 2017Notice of Hearing Index #3
Date: December 08, 2017Order Appointing Visitor Filed By: Name Not Available Online Index #4
Date: December 08, 2017Notice of Filing of Order Index #5
Date: December 08, 2017Affidavit of Mailing Index #10
Date: December 29, 2017Acceptance of Appointment and Oath Index #11
Date: December 29, 2017Proposed Order or Document Index #12
Date: December 29, 2017Proposed Order or Document Index #13
Date: December 29, 2017Notice of Case Assignment Index #15
Date: January 05, 2018Scheduling Order Index #16
Date: January 08, 2018Notice of Filing of Order Index #17
Date: January 09, 2018Scheduling Order Judicial Officer: Yon, Tamara Lynn Index #18
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Filing of Order Index #19
Date: January 26, 2018Order Granting Guardianship Judicial Officer: Yon, Tamara Lynn Index #21
Date: February 14, 2018Notice of Filing of Order Index #22
Date: February 15, 2018Order Terminating and Discharging Guardian and Conservator Index #28
Date: May 17, 2019Notice of Entry of Order Right to Appeal-Ward or Prot Person Index #24
Date: February 15, 2018Notice of Filing of Order Index #29
Date: May 21, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index #29 | |
May 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order Index # 29
Judge: Yon, Tamara Lynn |
|
May 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Subject to Guardianship/Conservatorship Deceased (Judicial Officer: Yon, Tamara Lynn)
Judge: Yon, Tamara Lynn |
|
May 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Terminating and Discharging Guardian and Conservator Index #28 | |
May 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Terminating and Discharging Guardian-Conservator Index # 28
Judge: Yon, Tamara Lynn |
|
May 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Taken Under Advisement Judicial Officer: Remick, Jeffrey Scott Index #27 | |
May 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Taken Under Advisement Index # 27 (Judicial Officer: Remick, Jeffrey Scott )
Judge: Yon, Tamara Lynn |
|
April 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice to File or Appear - Guardian-Conservator Filed By: Professional Guardian Camperud, Debra Index #26 | |
April 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice to File or Appear - Guardian-Conservator Index # 26
Judge: Yon, Tamara Lynn |
|
January 03, 2019 | Docket Event | DHS Background Check Filed By: Professional Guardian Camperud, Debra Index #25 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.