Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Findings Of Fact Conclusions Of Law And Order filed a(n) Commitment - Mentally Ill case in the jurisdiction of Polk County, MN, . Polk County, MN Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2006 |
CategoryCommitment - Mentally Ill |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationPolk County, MN |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Historical NICS Pass Not Sent - No Commitment 1994 to 2010 | |
July 03, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order | |
July 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order Terminating Proceeding and Discharging Patient (Judicial Officer: Marben, Kurt J. )
Judge: Marben, Kurt J. |
|
June 28, 2007 | Docket Event | 6-Month Report | |
June 19, 2007 | Docket Event | Reminder Notice | |
March 23, 2007 | Docket Event | 60-90 Day Commitment Report | |
March 21, 2007 | Docket Event | Reminder Notice | |
January 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order (Judicial Officer: Yon, Tamara Lynn )
Judge: Yon, Tamara Lynn |
|
January 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
Findings of Fact Conclusions of Law and Order (Judicial Officer: Yon, Tamara Lynn )
Judge: Yon, Tamara Lynn |
|
December 29, 2006 | Docket Event | Other Document |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.