Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Fnd Of Fact-Conclusions Of Law-Order For Judg And Decree Index # 31 filed a(n) Paternity - Family case in the jurisdiction of Polk County, MN, . Polk County, MN Superior Courts with Rasmusson, Anne Marie presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 28, 2021 |
CategoryPaternity |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPolk County, MN |
Matter TypePaternity |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Appendix A to Family Court Order Index # 33
Judge: Rasmusson, Anne Marie |
|
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index # 34
Judge: Rasmusson, Anne Marie |
|
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Judgment Index # 32
Judge: Rasmusson, Anne Marie |
|
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Judgment (Judicial Officer: Rasmusson, Anne Marie)
Judge: Rasmusson, Anne Marie |
|
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Fnd of Fact-Conclusions of Law-Order for Judg and Decree Index # 31 (Judicial Officer: Rasmusson, Anne Marie )
Judge: Rasmusson, Anne Marie |
|
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Taken Under Advisement Index # 29 (Judicial Officer: Rasmusson, Anne Marie )
Judge: Rasmusson, Anne Marie |
|
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order or Document Index # 30
Judge: Rasmusson, Anne Marie |
|
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order Index # 28
Judge: Rasmusson, Anne Marie |
|
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order for Hearing Index # 27 (Judicial Officer: Rasmusson, Anne Marie )
Judge: Rasmusson, Anne Marie |
|
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Taken Under Advisement Index # 26 (Judicial Officer: Rasmusson, Anne Marie )
Judge: Rasmusson, Anne Marie |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.