Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Polk County, MN, . Polk County, MN Superior Courts with Rasmusson, Anne Marie presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 16, 2022 |
CategoryChange Of Name |
Last RefreshedSeptember 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPolk County, MN |
Matter TypeName Change |
Case Outcome TypeChange Of Name Granted |
Affidavit of Mailing
Date: March 28, 2022Notice of Filing of Order by Attorney or Party
Date: March 28, 2022Notice of Filing of Order
Date: March 24, 2022Order Granting Name Change
Date: March 23, 2022Proposed Order or Document
Date: March 22, 2022Certify Personal Service
Date: March 08, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions
Date: February 25, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: February 25, 2022Notice of Deficiency
Date: February 18, 2022Notice of Filing of Order
Date: February 18, 2022Order Granting In Forma Pauperis
Date: February 18, 2022Application for Name Change
Date: February 16, 2022Certificate of Representation
Date: February 16, 2022Motion
Date: February 16, 2022Correspondence for Judicial Approval
Date: March 23, 2022Proposed Order or Document
Date: February 16, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing | |
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order by Attorney or Party | |
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order | |
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Name Change
Judge: Rasmusson, Anne Marie |
|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Correspondence for Judicial Approval | |
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document | |
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Taken Under Advisement
Judge: Davies, Heidi |
|
March 22, 2022 | Hearing | Hearing Held Using Remote Technology | |
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Certify Personal Service | |
February 25, 2022 | Hearing | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.