Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Pacifica Mn Llc D B A North Star Terrace, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Handy, Gretchen - Lead Attorney, against Arguelies, Melissa, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, MN, . Polk County, MN Superior Courts with Davies, Heidi presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 28, 2022 |
CategoryEviction (Ud) |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPolk County, MN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Complaint-Civil Filed By: Attorney Handy, Gretchen Index #1
Date: October 28, 2022Other Document Index #3
Date: October 28, 2022Other Document Index #5
Date: October 28, 2022Affidavit of Service by Posting Index #8
Date: November 07, 2022Eviction Summons Index #6
Date: November 02, 2022Other Document Index #2
Date: October 28, 2022Other Document Index #4
Date: October 28, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #7
Date: November 02, 2022Affidavit of Not Found Index #10
Date: November 07, 2022Notice of Filing of Order Index #13
Date: November 18, 2022Order and Judgment-Eviction Judicial Officer: Remick, Jeffrey Scott Index #12
Date: November 17, 2022Affidavit of Service Index #9
Date: November 07, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index #13 | |
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Order and Judgment-Eviction Judicial Officer: Remick, Jeffrey Scott Index #12 | |
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Taken Under Advisement Judicial Officer: Davies, Heidi Index #11 | |
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Taken Under Advisement Index # 11 (Judicial Officer: Davies, Heidi )
Judge: Davies, Heidi |
|
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service by Posting Index #8 | |
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Not Found Index #10 | |
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service Index #9 | |
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Not Found Index # 10 | |
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service Index # 9 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.