Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hearing filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Polk County, MN, . Polk County, MN Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2022 |
CategoryChange Of Name |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPolk County, MN |
Matter TypeName Change |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Taken Under Advisement Index # 10 (Judicial Officer: Davies, Heidi )
Judge: Davies, Heidi |
|
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 9 | |
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Criminal Background Check - Name Change Index # 6 | |
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Index # 7 | |
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 8 | |
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Receipts Index # 5 | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Deficiency Index # 3 | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Consent to Criminal Background Check Index # 2 | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Consent to Criminal Background Check Index # 4 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.