Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hearing filed a(n) Civil Other/Misc. case in the jurisdiction of Polk County, MN, . Polk County, MN Superior Courts with Rasmusson, Anne Marie presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2021 |
CategoryCivil Other/Misc. |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationPolk County, MN |
|
Case Outcome TypeClosed Administratively |
Notice of Deficiency
Date: March 04, 2022Petition for Restoration of Firearm Rights
Date: December 17, 2021Notice of Deficiency
Date: December 20, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: April 11, 2022Notice of Case Filing
Date: April 11, 2022Petition for Restoration of Firearm Rights
Date: May 18, 2022Court Clerk Minutes
Date: May 25, 2022Order Granting Restoration of Firearm Rights
Date: May 27, 2022Notice of Filing of Order
Date: June 01, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index # 10 | |
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Closed administratively | |
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order | |
May 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Restoration of Firearm Rights Index # 9 (Judicial Officer: Rasmusson, Anne Marie )
Judge: Rasmusson, Anne Marie |
|
May 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Restoration of Firearm Rights
Judge: Rasmusson, Anne Marie |
|
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Court Clerk Minutes Index # 8 | |
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Taken Under Advisement Index # 7 (Judicial Officer: Rasmusson, Anne Marie )
Judge: Rasmusson, Anne Marie |
|
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Using Remote Technology | |
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Court Clerk Minutes | |
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Taken Under Advisement
Judge: Rasmusson, Anne Marie |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.