Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Anderson, Brittany, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Polk County, MN, . Polk County, MN Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2021 |
CategoryForfeiture |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationPolk County, MN |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Memorandum Index # 14 | |
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index # 13 | |
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Dismissal With Prejudice - Judgment | |
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order for Dismissal Index # 12 (Judicial Officer: Rasmusson, Anne Marie )
Judge: Rasmusson, Anne Marie |
|
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index # 11 | |
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order for Hearing Index # 10 (Judicial Officer: Rasmusson, Anne Marie )
Judge: Rasmusson, Anne Marie |
|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Taken Under Advisement Index # 9 (Judicial Officer: Rasmusson, Anne Marie )
Judge: Rasmusson, Anne Marie |
|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Using Remote Technology | |
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Correspondence Index # 8 | |
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 7 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.