Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Findings Of Fact Conclusions Of Law And Order Index # 16 filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Polk County, MN, . Polk County, MN Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2021 |
CategoryChange Of Name |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPolk County, MN |
Matter TypeName Change |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Other Document Index # 20 | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index # 19 | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Findings of Fact Conclusions of Law and Order Index # 18 (Judicial Officer: Remick, Jeffrey Scott )
Judge: Remick, Jeffrey Scott |
|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index # 17 | |
February 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Findings of Fact Conclusions of Law and Order Index # 16 (Judicial Officer: Remick, Jeffrey Scott )
Judge: Remick, Jeffrey Scott |
|
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index # 15 | |
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Name Change Index # 14 (Judicial Officer: Harbott, Corey )
Judge: Harbott, Corey |
|
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Taken Under Advisement Index # 13 (Judicial Officer: Davies, Heidi )
Judge: Davies, Heidi |
|
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Using Remote Technology | |
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 12 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.