Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Findings And Order Index # 7 filed a(n) Civil Other/Misc. case in the jurisdiction of Polk County, MN, . Polk County, MN Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
CategoryCivil Other/Misc. |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationPolk County, MN |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Returned Mail Index # 9 | |
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index # 8 | |
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Findings and Order Index # 7 (Judicial Officer: Yon, Tamara Lynn )
Judge: Yon, Tamara Lynn |
|
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Closed administratively | |
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Correspondence Index # 6 | |
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing Index # 5 | |
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing Index # 4 | |
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Motion and Motion Index # 2 | |
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit for Proceeding In Forma Pauperis Index # 1 | |
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Granting In Forma Pauperis Index # 3 (Judicial Officer: Rasmusson, Anne Marie )
Judge: Rasmusson, Anne Marie |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.