Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lvnv Funding, Llc, filed a(n) Conciliation case represented by Barry, Christine Allison - Lead Attorney, against Corona, Anna, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, MN, . Polk County, MN Superior Courts with Closed presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2021 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPolk County, MN |
|
Statement of Claim Index #1
Date: December 21, 2021Correspondence Index #2
Date: December 21, 2021Proposed Order or Document Index #7
Date: February 09, 2022Notice of Filing of Order Index #9
Date: February 11, 2022Stipulation Filed By: Attorney BARRY, CHRISTINE ALLISON Index #6
Date: February 09, 2022Agreement Index #8
Date: February 10, 2022Summons Index #3
Date: December 22, 2021Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #5
Date: December 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index #9 | |
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index # 9 | |
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Settled | |
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Agreement Index #8 | |
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Agreement Index # 8 | |
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index #7 | |
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Stipulation Filed By: Attorney BARRY, CHRISTINE ALLISON Index #6 | |
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Using Remote Technology Filed By: Attorney BARRY, CHRISTINE ALLISON | |
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Using Remote Technology | |
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index # 7 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.