Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Essentia Health, filed a(n) Conciliation case represented by Sandy, Christina Rae - Lead Attorney, against Hruby, Matthew R, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, MN, . Polk County, MN Superior Courts with Davies, Heidi presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 05, 2021 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPolk County, MN |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Judgment
Date: December 09, 2021Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment
Date: December 09, 2021Summons
Date: November 09, 2021Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions
Date: November 09, 2021Order for Judgment
Date: December 08, 2021Statement of Claim
Date: November 05, 2021Affidavit of Increased Costs
Date: January 28, 2022Affidavit of Increased Costs Index #10
Date: January 28, 2022Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Davies, Heidi Index #6
Date: December 08, 2021Judgment Index #7
Date: December 09, 2021Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #3
Date: November 09, 2021Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #8
Date: December 09, 2021Statement of Claim Filed By: Attorney SANDY, CHRISTINA RAE Index #1
Date: November 05, 2021Summons Index #2
Date: November 09, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Increased Costs | |
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Increased Costs Index #10 | |
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Transcript of Judgment Issued Index #9 | |
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Transcript of Judgment Issued | |
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment | |
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment Index #7 | |
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #8 | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order for Judgment
Judge: Davies, Heidi |
|
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Davies, Heidi Index #6 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.