Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Olinger, Diane H., filed a(n) Formal Unsupervised case in the jurisdiction of Martin County, MN, . Martin County, MN Superior Courts with Trushenski, Michael D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 05, 2022 |
CategoryFormal Unsupervised |
Last RefreshedOctober 26, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMartin County, MN |
|
Petition for Discharge of Personal Representative Index #20
Date: August 09, 2023Proposed Order or Document Index #5
Date: July 05, 2022Consent to Accounting Index #22
Date: August 09, 2023Letters of General Administration Index #16
Date: August 16, 2022Petition for Frml Adjudication of Intestacy-Determ of Heirs Index #1
Date: July 05, 2022Affidavit of Mailing Index #10
Date: July 11, 2022Notice of Filing of Order Index #28
Date: August 10, 2023Proposed Order or Document Index #4
Date: July 05, 2022Copy Request Index #17
Date: August 23, 2022Notice of Filing of Order Index #7
Date: July 07, 2022Proposed Order or Document Index #3
Date: July 05, 2022Order and Notice of Hearing Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D Index #9
Date: July 07, 2022Affidavit of Publication Index #11
Date: July 26, 2022Proposed Order or Document Index #24
Date: August 09, 2023Acceptance of Appointment and Oath Index #2
Date: July 05, 2022Proposed Order or Document Index #25
Date: August 09, 2023Copy Request Index #6
Date: July 05, 2022Notice of Filing of Order Index #31
Date: August 10, 2023Notice of Filing of Order Index #14
Date: August 16, 2022Inventory and Appraisement Index #18
Date: August 09, 2023Petition for Ord of Comp Settle of Estate-Decree of Distrib Index #21
Date: August 09, 2023Final Accounting Index #19
Date: August 09, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index #28 | |
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Allow Final Acct , Settling Estate, Order of Distrib Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D Index #27 | |
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index #31 | |
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Discharging Personal Representative Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D Index #30 | |
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition for Discharge of Personal Representative Index #20 | |
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Consent to Accounting Index #22 | |
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index #24 | |
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index #25 | |
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Inventory and Appraisement Index #18 | |
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition for Ord of Comp Settle of Estate-Decree of Distrib Index #21 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.