Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jensen, Jeffrey, filed a(n) Formal Unsupervised case in the jurisdiction of Martin County, MN, . Martin County, MN Superior Courts with Bentz, Darci J. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2021 |
CategoryFormal Unsupervised |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMartin County, MN |
|
Order and Notice of Hearing Judicial Officer: Bentz, Darci J. Index #13
Date: January 19, 2022Copy Request Index #23
Date: April 14, 2022Notice of Filing of Order Index #14
Date: January 19, 2022Copy Request Index #25
Date: October 24, 2022Will Index #8
Date: December 30, 2021Petition for Formal Probate of Will-Appt PR Rep-Unsupervised Index #7
Date: December 28, 2021Order and Notice of Hearing Judicial Officer: Bentz, Darci J. Index #9
Date: January 03, 2022Affidavit of Mailing Index #12
Date: January 04, 2022Acceptance of Appointment and Oath Index #2
Date: December 28, 2021Certificate of Representation Index #1
Date: December 28, 2021Notice of Filing of Order Index #10
Date: January 03, 2022Proposed Order or Document Index #6
Date: December 28, 2021Proposed Order or Document Index #4
Date: December 28, 2021Proposed Order or Document Index #5
Date: December 28, 2021Letters Testamentary Index #20
Date: March 07, 2022Affidavit of Mailing Index #16
Date: January 20, 2022Correspondence Index #24
Date: September 16, 2022Affidavit of Publication Index #17
Date: February 07, 2022Notice of Filing of Order Index #22
Date: March 07, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Copy Request Index #25 | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Correspondence Index #24 | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Index # 24
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
May 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Claims Due
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Claims Due
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
April 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Copy Request Index #23 | |
April 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Copy Request Index # 23
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Letters Testamentary Index #20 | |
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Order for Frml Probate of Will-Appointment of Pers Rep-Unsup Judicial Officer: Bentz, Darci J. Index #19 | |
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index #22 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.