Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Williamson, Steven V., filed a(n) Formal Unsupervised case in the jurisdiction of Martin County, MN, . Martin County, MN Superior Courts with Trushenski, Michael D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2020 |
CategoryFormal Unsupervised |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMartin County, MN |
|
Proposed Order or Document Index #27
Date: September 24, 2021Affidavit of Mailing Index #28
Date: September 24, 2021Inventory Index #29
Date: September 30, 2021Notice of Filing of Order Index #41
Date: December 28, 2021Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Index #42
Date: April 04, 2022Proposed Order or Document Index #38
Date: December 28, 2021Order Discharging Personal Representative Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D Index #40
Date: December 28, 2021Petition for Discharge of Personal Representative Index #37
Date: December 28, 2021Other Document Index #6
Date: January 06, 2021Receipts for Assets by Distributee Index #35
Date: December 28, 2021Receipts for Assets by Distributee Index #34
Date: December 28, 2021Proposed Order or Document Index #4
Date: December 23, 2020Acceptance of Appointment and Oath Index #5
Date: December 23, 2020Petition for Formal Probate of Will-Appt PR Rep-Unsupervised Index #1
Date: December 23, 2020Proposed Order or Document Index #3
Date: December 23, 2020Proposed Order or Document Index #2
Date: December 23, 2020Affidavit-Other Index #24
Date: September 24, 2021Copy Request Index #20
Date: March 10, 2021Affidavit-Other Index #25
Date: September 24, 2021Petition to Allow Final Acctg., Settle and Distribute Estate Index #26
Date: September 24, 2021Copy Request Index #21
Date: May 11, 2021Inventory Index #22
Date: September 24, 2021Notice of Filing of Order Index #18
Date: March 09, 2021Final Accounting Index #23
Date: September 24, 2021Affidavit of Service of Notice to the Comm of Human Services Index #19
Date: March 10, 2021Affidavit of Service Index #43
Date: April 04, 2022Notice of Filing of Order Index #33
Date: October 26, 2021Receipts for Assets by Distributee Index #36
Date: December 28, 2021Consent to Final Acct-Issuance of Decree-Order of Distrib Index #30
Date: October 08, 2021Affidavit of Mailing Index #12
Date: January 22, 2021Affidavit of Publication Index #13
Date: February 16, 2021Notice of Filing of Order Index #11
Date: January 21, 2021Notice of Case Filing and Assignment Index #10
Date: January 21, 2021Order and Notice of Hearing Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D Index #8
Date: January 20, 2021Will Index #7
Date: January 20, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Index #42 | |
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service Index #43 | |
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Index # 43
Judge: Trushenski, Michael D |
|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Index # 42
Judge: Trushenski, Michael D |
|
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index #41 | |
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index #38 | |
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Discharging Personal Representative Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D Index #40 | |
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition for Discharge of Personal Representative Index #37 | |
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Receipts for Assets by Distributee Index #35 | |
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Receipts for Assets by Distributee Index #34 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.