Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Aco-Acceptance & Oath filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Martin County, MN, . Martin County, MN Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 17, 2003 |
CategoryGuardianship/Conservatorship |
Last RefreshedOctober 16, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationMartin County, MN |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2006 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order | |
August 07, 2006 | Docket Event | Discharge of guardian | |
August 07, 2006 | Docket Event | Discharge of conservator | |
August 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order-Other (Judicial Officer: Walker, Robert D. )
Judge: Walker, Robert D. |
|
July 17, 2006 | Docket Event | Petition for Discharge | |
May 31, 2006 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing | |
April 27, 2006 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order | |
April 26, 2006 | Docket Event | Affidavit-Other | |
April 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order-Other (Judicial Officer: Walker, Robert D. )
Judge: Walker, Robert D. |
|
March 08, 2006 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.