Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Aco-Acceptance & Oath filed a(n) Formal Unsupervised case in the jurisdiction of Martin County, MN, . Martin County, MN Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2003 |
CategoryFormal Unsupervised |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationMartin County, MN |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2006 | Docket Event | Statement to Close | |
July 13, 2006 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing | |
October 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order (Judicial Officer: Walker, Robert D. )
Judge: Walker, Robert D. |
|
October 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order of Complete Settlement of Estate and Decree of Distrib (Judicial Officer: Walker, Robert D. )
Judge: Walker, Robert D. |
|
October 13, 2005 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing | |
October 05, 2005 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order | |
October 05, 2005 | Docket Event | Order for Hearing | |
September 26, 2005 | Docket Event | Other Document | |
September 26, 2005 | Docket Event | Petition for Ord of Comp Settle of Estate-Decree of Distrib | |
September 26, 2005 | Docket Event | Memorandum |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.