Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) Expedited Process case in the jurisdiction of Martin County, MN, . Martin County, MN Superior Courts with Rolfsrud, Stephen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRolfsrud, Stephen Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 25, 2003 |
CategoryExpedited Process |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMartin County, MN |
|
Case Outcome TypeSupport Order |
Notice of Filing of Order
Date: March 19, 2018Order to Show Cause
Date: December 14, 2017Notice of Filing of Order
Date: June 29, 2017Order for Child Support
Date: June 29, 2017Order for Child Support
Date: March 19, 2018Notice of Filing of Order
Date: December 11, 2015Order for Child Support
Date: December 11, 2015Notice of Hearing
Date: October 22, 2015Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment
Date: October 05, 2015Fnd of Fact-Conclusions of Law-Order for Judg and Decree
Date: October 05, 2015Order for Appointment of Attorney
Date: September 01, 2015Notice of Filing of Order
Date: September 02, 2015Warrant Issued
Date: August 26, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order | |
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order for Child Support
Judge: Rolfsrud, Stephen |
|
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proposed Child Support Order
Judge: Rolfsrud, Stephen |
|
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Default | |
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Taken Under Advisement
Judge: Rolfsrud, Stephen |
|
February 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service | |
February 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Supporting Affidavit of Child Support Officer | |
February 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Motion for Modification of Child Support | |
February 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Expedited Process | |
December 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause
Judge: Rolfsrud, Stephen |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.