Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Clo-Closed filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Martin County, MN, . Martin County, MN Superior Courts with Walker, Robert D. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWalker, Robert D. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 23, 2004 |
CategoryDissolution With Child |
Last RefreshedOctober 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMartin County, MN |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeDissolution/Annulment Granted |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 24, 2005 | Docket Event |
Other Document
Judge: Walker, Robert D. |
|
March 24, 2005 | Docket Event |
Warrant Issued
Judge: Walker, Robert D. |
|
January 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Mailing
Judge: Walker, Robert D. |
|
January 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (Judicial Officer: Walker, Robert D. )
Judge: Walker, Robert D. |
|
January 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause
Judge: Walker, Robert D. |
|
November 08, 2004 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (Judicial Officer: Walker, Robert D. )
Judge: Walker, Robert D. |
|
November 08, 2004 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause
Judge: Walker, Robert D. |
|
April 08, 2004 | Docket Event |
CLO-Closed (Judicial Officer: Judge, Presiding )
Judge: Walker, Robert D. |
|
April 08, 2004 | Docket Event |
Dissolution/annulment granted (Judicial Officer: Judge, Presiding) Converted Disposition: Related Participants: BEHRENDS, KIM MARIE
Judge: Walker, Robert D. |
|
April 08, 2004 | Docket Event |
CLO-Closed
Judge: Judge, Presiding |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.