Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Citibank, N.A, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Boston, Marcus Sean - Lead Attorney, against Hanna, Damon D, in the jurisdiction of Martin County, MN, . Martin County, MN Superior Courts with Trushenski, Michael D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTrushenski, Michael D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 04, 2022 |
CategoryConsumer Credit Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMartin County, MN |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Satisfaction of Judgment Index #28
Date: February 17, 2023Affidavit of Increased Costs Index #27
Date: January 19, 2023Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #26
Date: January 09, 2023Affidavit of Service Index #15
Date: October 27, 2022Affidavit of Attorney Index #10
Date: October 27, 2022Answer Index #8
Date: October 14, 2022Notice of Case Filing and Assignment Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D Index #6
Date: October 05, 2022Notice of Motion and Motion Index #9
Date: October 27, 2022Affidavit of Service Index #7
Date: October 14, 2022Discovery Plan Index #5
Date: October 04, 2022Civil Cover Sheet Index #4
Date: October 04, 2022Certificate of Representation Index #3
Date: October 04, 2022Notice of Entry and Docketing of Judgment Index #25
Date: January 09, 2023Proposed Order or Document Index #14
Date: October 27, 2022Judgment Index #24
Date: January 09, 2023Proposed Order or Document Index #18
Date: December 05, 2022Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D Index #23
Date: January 09, 2023Affidavit of Service Index #19
Date: December 05, 2022Notice of Motion and Motion Index #17
Date: December 05, 2022Affidavit of No Answer, ID, Non-Military Status and Amt Due Index #12
Date: October 27, 2022Affidavit of Non-Military Status Index #13
Date: October 27, 2022Memorandum Index #11
Date: October 27, 2022Affidavit of Non-Military Status Index #20
Date: December 05, 2022Affidavit of Service Index #2
Date: October 04, 2022Summons and Complaint Index #1
Date: October 04, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment Index #28 | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Increased Costs Index #27 | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #26 | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry and Docketing of Judgment Index #25 | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment Index #24 | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D Index #23 | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Taken Under Advisement Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D Index #21 | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Held Remote
Judge: Trushenski, Michael D |
|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Processed Judgment Entry and Docketing
Judge: Trushenski, Michael D |
|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index # 26
Judge: Trushenski, Michael D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.