Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
City Of Granada, filed a(n) Civil Other/Misc. case represented by Frundt, David Francis - Lead Attorney, against Mortenson, Rose, in the jurisdiction of Martin County, MN, . Martin County, MN Superior Courts with Trushenski, Michael presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 06, 2022 |
CategoryCivil Other/Misc. |
Last RefreshedOctober 26, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMartin County, MN |
|
Affidavit of Attorney Index #4
Date: September 16, 2022Affidavit of Mailing Index #5
Date: September 16, 2022Certificate of Representation Index #1
Date: September 06, 2022Notice of Case Filing and Assignment Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D Index #2
Date: September 06, 2022Notice of Motion and Motion Index #3
Date: September 16, 2022Notice of Entry of Judgment Index #13
Date: December 15, 2022Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D Index #10
Date: November 14, 2022Judgment Index #12
Date: December 15, 2022Certify Personal Service Index #6
Date: September 16, 2022Proposed Order or Document Index #8
Date: November 14, 2022Notice of Filing of Order Index #11
Date: November 14, 2022Satisfaction of Judgment Index #14
Date: December 30, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment Index #14 | |
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment Index #13 | |
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment Index #12 | |
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D Index #10 | |
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index #8 | |
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index #11 | |
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Filed By: Attorney FRUNDT, DAVID FRANCIS; Defendant Mortenson, Rose Index #7 | |
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing Held Remote
Judge: Trushenski, Michael D |
|
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 7
Judge: Trushenski, Michael D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.