Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Smith, Sandra Lee, filed a(n) Rent Escrow case against Bgb Properties, Llc, represented by Edmundson, Sara Lynn - Lead Attorney, in the jurisdiction of Martin County, MN, . Martin County, MN Superior Courts with Bentz, Darci J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBentz, Darci J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 04, 2022 |
CategoryRent Escrow |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMartin County, MN |
|
Affidavit for Escrow of Rent
Date: August 04, 2022Notice of Hearing Index #8
Date: August 05, 2022Notice of Filing of Order Index #11
Date: August 08, 2022Rent Escrow Decision and Order Judicial Officer: Bentz, Darci J. Index #17
Date: September 01, 2022Notice of Filing of Order Index #15
Date: August 19, 2022Order-Other Judicial Officer: Bentz, Darci J. Index #14
Date: August 19, 2022Order Granting In Forma Pauperis Judicial Officer: Bentz, Darci J. Index #10
Date: August 08, 2022Order to Recuse Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D Index #5
Date: August 05, 2022Other Document Index #3
Date: August 04, 2022Notice of Case Filing and Assignment Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D Index #4
Date: August 05, 2022Notice of Filing of Order Index #6
Date: August 05, 2022Notice of Case Reassignment Index #7
Date: August 05, 2022Affidavit for Escrow of Rent Index #1
Date: August 04, 2022Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #18
Date: September 01, 2022Other Document Index #16
Date: September 01, 2022Order Granting In Forma Pauperis
Date: August 08, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions
Date: August 05, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions
Date: August 15, 2022Other Document
Date: August 04, 2022Notice of Case Filing and Assignment
Date: August 05, 2022Order to Recuse
Date: August 05, 2022Notice of Filing of Order
Date: August 05, 2022Notice of Case Reassignment
Date: August 05, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: August 05, 2022Notice of Filing of Order
Date: August 08, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Exhibit Receipt or Authorization to Release or Destroy Filed By: Plaintiff Smith, Sandra Lee Index #20 | |
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice to Authorize Release - Destroy Exhibit or Deposition Filed By: Plaintiff Smith, Sandra Lee Index #19 | |
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice to Authorize Release - Destroy Exhibit or Deposition Index # 19
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Rent Escrow Decision and Order Judicial Officer: Bentz, Darci J. Index #17 | |
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #18 | |
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Other Document Index #16 | |
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Other Document Index # 16
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index # 18
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Rent Escrow Decision and Order Index # 17 (Judicial Officer: Bentz, Darci J. )
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Judgment (Judicial Officer: Bentz, Darci J.)
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.