Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Credit Acceptance Corporation, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Hicks, William C, Nguyen, Phong Hoang - Lead Attorney, against Geddes, Heather, Lindsay, Patrick, in the jurisdiction of Martin County, MN, . Martin County, MN Superior Courts with Trushenski, Michael D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 06, 2022 |
CategoryConsumer Credit Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMartin County, MN |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Notice of Entry and Docketing of Judgment
Date: September 06, 2022Judgment
Date: September 06, 2022Order for Judgment
Date: September 02, 2022Affidavit of Mailing
Date: July 24, 2022Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment
Date: September 06, 2022Proposed Order or Document
Date: July 24, 2022Notice of Motion and Motion
Date: July 24, 2022Affidavit of Attorney
Date: July 24, 2022Certificate of Representation
Date: July 06, 2022Civil Cover Sheet
Date: July 06, 2022Notice of Case Filing and Assignment
Date: July 07, 2022Memorandum
Date: July 24, 2022Affidavit of Service
Date: July 06, 2022Summons and Complaint
Date: July 06, 2022Affidavit of No Answer, ID, Non-Military Status and Amt Due
Date: July 24, 2022Discovery Plan
Date: July 06, 2022Affidavit of Attorney Index #8
Date: July 24, 2022Affidavit of No Answer, ID, Non-Military Status and Amt Due Index #10
Date: July 24, 2022Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees Index #11
Date: July 24, 2022Discovery Plan Index #5
Date: July 06, 2022Memorandum Index #9
Date: July 24, 2022Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D Index #15
Date: September 02, 2022Notice of Motion and Motion Index #7
Date: July 24, 2022Affidavit of Service Index #2
Date: July 06, 2022Summons and Complaint Index #1
Date: July 06, 2022Civil Cover Sheet Index #4
Date: July 06, 2022Certificate of Representation Index #3
Date: July 06, 2022Proposed Order or Document Index #12
Date: July 24, 2022Notice of Entry and Docketing of Judgment Index #17
Date: September 06, 2022Affidavit of Mailing Index #13
Date: July 24, 2022Judgment Index #16
Date: September 06, 2022Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #18
Date: September 06, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry and Docketing of Judgment | |
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment | |
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry and Docketing of Judgment Index #17 | |
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment Index #16 | |
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #18 | |
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Processed Judgment Entry and Docketing | |
September 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order for Judgment
Judge: Trushenski, Michael D |
|
September 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D Index #15 | |
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.