Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Welcome Housing Investors, Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Turner, Douglass E. - Lead Attorney, against Corona, Alexandra Inez, in the jurisdiction of Martin County, MN, . Martin County, MN Superior Courts with Trushenski, Michael D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 14, 2022 |
CategoryEviction (Ud) |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMartin County, MN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeEviction, Non-Payment Of Rent - Judgment |
Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment
Date: July 29, 2022Order and Judgment-Eviction
Date: July 29, 2022Affidavit of Service by Posting
Date: July 21, 2022Affidavit of Mailing
Date: July 20, 2022Affidavit of Plaintiff
Date: July 20, 2022Affidavit of Not Found
Date: July 20, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions
Date: July 01, 2022Notice of Judicial Determination
Date: June 24, 2022Eviction Summons
Date: July 01, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions
Date: June 24, 2022Eviction Summons
Date: June 24, 2022Request for Continuance
Date: June 24, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions
Date: June 15, 2022Judgment
Date: July 29, 2022Complaint-Civil
Date: June 14, 2022Eviction Summons
Date: June 15, 2022Writ of Recovery of Premises
Date: August 01, 2022Request for Writ of Recovery
Date: July 29, 2022Order and Judgment-Eviction Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D Index #14
Date: July 29, 2022Returned Mail Filed By: Defendant Corona, Alexandra Inez Index #23
Date: September 06, 2022Notice of Entry and Docketing of Judgment Index #22
Date: August 30, 2022Affidavit of Identification of Judgment Debtor Index #20
Date: August 29, 2022Affidavit of Service Index #21
Date: August 29, 2022Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #15
Date: July 29, 2022Complaint-Civil Index #1
Date: June 14, 2022Affidavit of Service by Posting Index #13
Date: July 21, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #9
Date: July 01, 2022Eviction Summons Index #5
Date: June 24, 2022Judgment Index #16
Date: July 29, 2022Request for Writ of Recovery Index #17
Date: July 29, 2022Affidavit of Not Found Index #11
Date: July 20, 2022Request for Continuance Index #4
Date: June 24, 2022Affidavit of Mailing Index #12
Date: July 20, 2022Affidavit-Other Index #19
Date: August 29, 2022Affidavit of Plaintiff Index #10
Date: July 20, 2022Eviction Summons Index #8
Date: July 01, 2022Notice of Judicial Determination Index #7
Date: June 24, 2022Writ of Recovery of Premises Index #18
Date: August 01, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #3
Date: June 15, 2022Eviction Summons Index #2
Date: June 15, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Returned Mail Filed By: Defendant Corona, Alexandra Inez Index #23 | |
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Index # 23
Judge: Trushenski, Michael D |
|
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry and Docketing of Judgment Index #22 | |
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Processed Judgment Entry and Docketing
Judge: Trushenski, Michael D |
|
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry and Docketing of Judgment Index # 22
Judge: Trushenski, Michael D |
|
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Judgment (Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D) Monetary Award ( Status: Active , Debtor: Alexandra Inez Corona , Entered: 08/30/2022 , Docketed: 08/30/2022 , 11:10 AM , Original Principal: $495.00 )
Judge: Trushenski, Michael D |
|
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Identification of Judgment Debtor Index #20 | |
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service Index #21 | |
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit-Other Index #19 | |
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Index # 21
Judge: Trushenski, Michael D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.