Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mchs Fairmont, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Hanson, Gregory Eric - Lead Attorney, against Barrientos, Primitivo N, Barrientos, Rosemary A, in the jurisdiction of Martin County, MN, . Martin County, MN Superior Courts with Trushenski, Michael D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 26, 2022 |
CategoryConsumer Credit Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMartin County, MN |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment
Date: July 25, 2022Notice of Entry and Docketing of Judgment
Date: July 25, 2022Judgment
Date: July 25, 2022Order for Judgment
Date: July 24, 2022Proposed Order or Document
Date: July 21, 2022Certify Personal Service
Date: May 26, 2022Notice of Case Filing and Assignment
Date: May 26, 2022Civil Cover Sheet
Date: May 26, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions
Date: June 16, 2022Summons and Complaint
Date: May 26, 2022Writ of Execution Index #14
Date: March 06, 2023Affidavit of No Answer, ID, Non-Military Status and Amt Due Index #6
Date: July 13, 2022Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #12
Date: July 25, 2022Notice of Entry and Docketing of Judgment Index #11
Date: July 25, 2022Proposed Order or Document Index #7
Date: July 21, 2022Civil Cover Sheet Index #1
Date: May 26, 2022Request for Writ of Execution Index #13
Date: March 02, 2023Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D Index #9
Date: July 24, 2022Certify Personal Service Index #3
Date: May 26, 2022Summons and Complaint Index #2
Date: May 26, 2022Judgment Index #10
Date: July 25, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Index #14 | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Writ of Execution Index #13 | |
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment | |
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry and Docketing of Judgment | |
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #12 | |
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry and Docketing of Judgment Index #11 | |
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment Index #10 | |
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Processed Judgment Entry and Docketing
Judge: Trushenski, Michael D |
|
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index # 12
Judge: Trushenski, Michael D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.