Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Heidecker, Craig, Johnson, James L., filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Frundt, David Francis - Lead Attorney, against Schwieger, Elizabeth, Schwieger, Vincent E., Smith, Ethel, Smith, Wayne B., in the jurisdiction of Martin County, MN, . Martin County, MN Superior Courts with Bentz, Darci J. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 18, 2022 |
CategoryQuiet Title |
Last RefreshedOctober 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMartin County, MN |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Proposed Order or Document
Date: June 27, 2022Notice of Case Filing and Assignment
Date: May 19, 2022Certificate of Representation
Date: May 18, 2022Affidavit of Attorney
Date: May 18, 2022Request for Default Hearing
Date: June 27, 2022Affidavit of Publication
Date: June 27, 2022Summons
Date: May 18, 2022Copy Request
Date: August 02, 2022Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment
Date: August 02, 2022Judgment
Date: August 02, 2022Order for Judgment
Date: August 01, 2022Complaint-Civil
Date: May 18, 2022Proposed Order or Document Index #8
Date: June 27, 2022Proposed Order or Document Index #9
Date: June 27, 2022Copy Request Index #14
Date: August 02, 2022Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #13
Date: August 02, 2022Judgment Index #12
Date: August 02, 2022Request for Default Hearing Index #7
Date: June 27, 2022Certificate of Representation Index #4
Date: May 18, 2022Affidavit of Publication Index #6
Date: June 27, 2022Order for Judgment Judicial Officer: Bentz, Darci J. Index #11
Date: August 01, 2022Complaint-Civil Index #2
Date: May 18, 2022Affidavit of Attorney Index #3
Date: May 18, 2022Summons Index #1
Date: May 18, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Copy Request | |
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment | |
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Copy Request Index #14 | |
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #13 | |
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment Index #12 | |
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Copy Request Index # 14
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index # 13
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Judgment Index # 12
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
|
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Judgment (Judicial Officer: Bentz, Darci J.)
Judge: Bentz, Darci J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.