Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Rehlek, Maxwell, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Dixon, Cole James - Lead Attorney, against Earl L. Bonsack, Inc., Getlinger, Christopher, represented by Kelly, Scott V - Lead Attorney, in the jurisdiction of Martin County, MN, . Martin County, MN Superior Courts with Trushenski, Michael D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2021 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMartin County, MN |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions
Date: July 05, 2022Scheduling Order
Date: February 14, 2022Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 12, 2022Notice of Filing of Order
Date: February 14, 2022Discovery Plan
Date: January 13, 2022Answer
Date: December 21, 2021Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions
Date: December 28, 2021Summons and Complaint
Date: December 17, 2021Notice of Case Filing and Assignment
Date: December 20, 2021Affidavit of Service
Date: December 17, 2021Affidavit of Service
Date: December 21, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: December 17, 2021Civil Cover Sheet Index #3
Date: December 17, 2021Summons and Complaint Index #1
Date: December 17, 2021Affidavit of Service Index #2
Date: December 17, 2021Notice of Case Filing and Assignment Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D Index #4
Date: December 20, 2021Answer Index #5
Date: December 21, 2021Judgment Index #15
Date: October 25, 2022Stipulation Index #13
Date: October 24, 2022Affidavit of Service Index #6
Date: December 21, 2021Order for Dismissal Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D Index #14
Date: October 24, 2022Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #7
Date: December 28, 2021Notice of Filing of Order Index #11
Date: February 14, 2022Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #16
Date: October 25, 2022Civil Cover Sheet Index #8
Date: January 12, 2022Discovery Plan Index #9
Date: January 13, 2022Scheduling Order Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D Index #10
Date: February 14, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment Index #15 | |
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #16 | |
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Stipulation Index #13 | |
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Order for Dismissal Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D Index #14 | |
July 05, 2022 | Hearing | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions | |
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Filed By: Attorney DIXON, COLE JAMES; Attorney KELLY, SCOTT V Index #12 | |
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 12
Judge: Trushenski, Michael D |
|
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Scheduling Order
Judge: Trushenski, Michael D |
|
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order | |
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Index #11 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.