Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Martin County Attorney, Terry W. Viesselman, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Odgren, Peter Albert - Lead Attorney, in the jurisdiction of Martin County, MN, . Martin County, MN Superior Courts with Trushenski, Michael D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 24, 2020 |
CategoryForfeiture |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationMartin County, MN |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Complaint-Civil Index #13
Date: October 30, 2020Order-Other Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D Index #5
Date: August 25, 2020Proposed Order or Document Index #2
Date: August 24, 2020Answer Index #9
Date: September 10, 2020Certificate of Representation Index #8
Date: September 10, 2020Correspondence Index #1
Date: August 24, 2020Affidavit of Service Index #11
Date: September 16, 2020Summons Index #12
Date: October 30, 2020Motion Index #15
Date: October 30, 2020Proposed Order or Document Index #16
Date: October 30, 2020Notice of Seizure and Intent to Forfeit Index #3
Date: August 25, 2020Notice of Filing of Order Index #6
Date: August 26, 2020Findings of Fact Conclusions of Law and Order Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D Index #18
Date: November 02, 2020Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #19
Date: November 02, 2020Correspondence Index #7
Date: September 10, 2020Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index #10
Date: September 16, 2020Proof of Service Index #14
Date: October 30, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Findings of Fact Conclusions of Law and Order Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D Index #18 | |
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #19 | |
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index # 19
Judge: Trushenski, Michael D |
|
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Findings of Fact Conclusions of Law and Order Index # 18 (Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D )
Judge: Trushenski, Michael D |
|
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Forfeiture Granted (Judicial Officer: Trushenski, Michael D)
Judge: Trushenski, Michael D |
|
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint-Civil Index #13 | |
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons Index #12 | |
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion Index #15 | |
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index #16 | |
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Index #14 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.